Grand'Maison, Anne (CPSO#: 73157)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 09 Nov 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 15 May 2001
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 09 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017