Granovsky, Ricardo Sergio (CPSO#: 69527)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1979

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1996