Granovsky, Shawna (CPSO#: 65289)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Marks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Marks ( CPSO# 56832 )
Dr. S. Granovsky ( CPSO# 65289 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
MG 350
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6838

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAWNA GRANOVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANOVSKY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993