Granovsky-Grisaru, Sorina (CPSO#: 68619)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The Hebrew University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 15 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 06 Dec 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 11 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Dec 1996