Grant, Aaron Leigh (CPSO#: 88646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C University Hospital
Department of Plastic Surgery
Room B8 030
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3321
Fax: 519-663-3289
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

746 Baseline Road East
London ON  N6C 5Z2
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron L. Grant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grant ( CPSO# 88646 )

Business Address:
LHSC-University Hospital
Department of Plastic Surgery
Room B8-030
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3321

Business Address:
746 Baseline Road East
London ON  N6C 5Z2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON LEIGH GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2014