Grant, Allison Lee-Anne (CPSO#: 88698)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Radiology Associates
Suite 302
1370 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4G4
Phone: (416) 231-3369
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allison Grant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grant ( CPSO# 88698 )

Business Address:
Radiology Associates
1370 Dundas Street East
Suite 302
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4G4
Phone Number: (416) 231-3369

Business Address:
585 University Avenue
1st Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 Aug 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLISON LEE-ANNE GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2014