Grant, Andrew Neal (CPSO#: 69401)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Nov 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital of Barrie
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 46611
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 2
279 Yonge St.
Barrie ON  L4N 7T9
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-8860
Fax: (705) 737-4733
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Grant and Dr. C. Kargel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kargel ( CPSO# 71116 )
Dr. A. Grant ( CPSO# 69401 )

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Business Address:
2 - 279 Yonge Street
Barrie ON  L4N 7T9
Phone Number: (705) 728-8860

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW NEAL GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1995