Grant Hall, Susan Claire (CPSO#: 52888)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: Grant, Susan Claire (used until: 17 Jun 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Grey Bruce Public Health: 101 17th Street, Owen Sound, ON N4K 0A5
Instructions: For patient records from 1999-2015 at the Sexual Health Clinic.
Date Received: 01 Jun 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017