Grant, Kevin Gordon James (CPSO#: 66367)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 909
2 Pancake Lane
Fonthill ON  L0S 1E0
Phone: (905) 892-3242
Fax: (905) 892-2147
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. J. Kevin Grant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Grant ( CPSO# 66367 )

Business Address:
2 Pancake Lane
P.O. Box 909
Fonthill ON  L0S 1E0
Phone Number: (905) 892-3242


Corporation Name: Bak, Grant, Zides Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN GORDON JAMES GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1993