Grant, Kevin Mathew (CPSO#: 71324)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
606-18 Wynford Dr
Toronto ON  M3C 3S2
Phone: (647) 352-8100
Fax: (647) 352-8200
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Myo Medical Md
1939 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 364-4052
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin M. Grant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Grant ( CPSO# 71324 )

Business Address:
Suite 606
18 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 3S2
Phone Number: (647) 352-8100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN MATHEW GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2003