Grant, Lorna Jean (CPSO#: 42767)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jul 1995


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 12 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 1995