Grant, Merle Elaine (CPSO#: 32670)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: P O Box 1356 1500 Avenue Road Toronto ON M5M 0A1
Date Received: 27 Apr 2015


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to: Dr. Merle Grant 1500 Avenue Road P.O BOX 135 Toronto, ON M5M 0A1
Date Received: 03 Jan 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017