Grant, Peter Alexander (CPSO#: 64030)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#132
6707 Elbow Drive SW
Calgary AB  T2V 0E3
Phone: (403) 777-3009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Northwest Territories
Nunavut
Saskatchewan
Yukon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER ALEXANDER GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 29 Aug 1997
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992