Grant, Peter Treacy (CPSO#: 101776)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Melbourne, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Palliative Care Centre
Room 16 712
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Electoral District: 10

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Sep 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2013