Grant, Peter Wynne (CPSO#: 25042)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter W. Grant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 11 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 706 5863 Leslie Street North York, ON M2H 1J8
Date Received: 22 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015