Granton, Jeffrey Thomas (CPSO#: 72305)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
LHSC - University Campus
P O Box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

268 Grosvener Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6000
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

800 Commissoners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeff Granton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Granton ( CPSO# 72305 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
LHSC - University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 625-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY THOMAS GRANTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2003