Grasswick, Linda Joan (CPSO#: 74310)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 11 Sep 2000 to 10 Sep 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 11 Sep 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006