Grattan, Michael James (CPSO#: 84619)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Paediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8237
Fax: (519) 685-8584
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Grattan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Grattan ( CPSO# 84619 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
Victoria Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES GRATTAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRATTAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 07 May 2012 to 03 Jun 2012
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2014