Gratton, Robert Jeffrey (CPSO#: 60909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Rd
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6106
Fax: (519) 646-6213
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Gratton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gratton ( CPSO# 60909 )

Business Address:
Lonon Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road
Suite B2-401
London ON  N6H 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 646-6106

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JEFFREY GRATTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRATTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1990