Gravelle, Catharine Anne (CPSO#: 72461)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: Gravelle, Anne Catharine (used until: 07 Jun 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200B
745 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T1
Phone: (613) 741-6767
Fax: (613) 741-4147
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne Gravelle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gravelle ( CPSO# 72461 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
Suite 200B
745 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T1
Phone Number: (613) 741-6767

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 15 Dec 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHARINE ANNE GRAVELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAVELLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 15 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2003