Gravenor, Donald St. Paul (CPSO#: 57024)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 10 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2005