Gray, Aileen Ann (CPSO#: 71331)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
275 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3G4
Phone: (613) 549-7477
Fax: (613) 344-2089
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gray Cummings Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gray ( CPSO# 71331 )
Dr. M. Cummings ( CPSO# 71070 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Business Address:
Cornerstone Medical Clinic
Suite 202
275 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3G4
Phone Number: (613) 549-7477

Business Address:
KFHT
After Hours Clinic
Suite 200
2437 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone Number: (613) 546-6652

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Dec 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AILEEN ANN GRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2000 to 31 Mar 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Apr 2001 to 31 Mar 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2002