Gray, Alice Ethel Whiteside (CPSO#: 11097)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1941

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Bacteriology Effective: 01 Jan 1952 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 10 Nov 1958 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 01 Dec 1952 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1942
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1989