Gray, Clare Elisabeth (CPSO#: 59703)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 1990

Summary

Former Name: Evans, Clare Elisabeth (used until: 16 Aug 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Outpatient Psychiatry Department
Children's Hospital Of
Eastern Ontario, 401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2683
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Gray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gray ( CPSO# 59703 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLARE ELISABETH GRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1990
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1991