Gray, Daryl Kenneth (CPSO#: 64975)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room E2-217
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-667-6583
Fax: 519-667-6546
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doucette Gray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Doucette ( CPSO# 64971 )
Dr. D. Gray ( CPSO# 64975 )

Business Address:
Room E2-217
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6583

Business Address:
436 Waterloo Street
London ON  N6B 2P2
Phone Number: (519) 438-5551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARYL KENNETH GRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993