Gray, Gordon Edmund (CPSO#: 13751)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1952
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Nov 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008