Gray, James Neal (CPSO#: 20464)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Aug 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2003