Gray, Joel (CPSO#: 104967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Queen's University
70 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: 613-544-2631 Ext. 4503
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL GRAY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GRAY is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. GRAY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GRAY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. GRAY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GRAY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GRAY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2014 to 14 Nov 2014
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 21 Sep 2015 to 18 Oct 2015
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018