Gray, Jonathan David (CPSO#: 76143)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Royal Ottawa Hospital
Forensic Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6361
Fax: (613) 798-2992
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Secure Treatment Unit
P.O. Box 1050
1804 Highway 2 East
Brockville ON  K6V 5W7
Canada
Phone: 613-345-1461
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Brockville Mental Health Centre
Forensic Treatment Unit
1804 Highway 2 East
P O 1050
Brockville ON  K6V 5T1
Canada
Phone: (613) 345-1461
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Gray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gray ( CPSO# 76143 )

Business Address:
PO Box 1050
1804 Highway 2 East
Brockville ON  K6V 5T1
Phone Number: (613) 345-1461

Business Address:
The Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group,Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN DAVID GRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 21 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2003 to 21 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006