Gray, Peter (CPSO#: 87853)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Gray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 8 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Website: rsrs.com Email: info@rsrs.com Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 04 Jan 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 5, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Peter Gray to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 5, 2017:

Dr. Gray ceased to practice medicine in Ontario in June 2016.

Prior to June 2016, the College received information about Dr. Gray's standard of practice and commenced an investigation. Subsequent to June 2016, the College received information from the Narcotics Monitoring System about Dr. Gray's prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Based on the information received, the College conducted investigations into whether Dr. Gray failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent.

Dr. Gray has ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services. He may only return to the practice of medicine in Ontario with the approval of the College.
Download Full Document (PDF)