Gray, Robin St. Clair (CPSO#: 69781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1408-750 West Broadway Ave
Vancouver BC  V5Z 1J4
Phone: (604) 876-3333
Fax: (604) 876-3314

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 29 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBIN ST. CLAIR GRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Feb 1996 to 06 Mar 1996
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 07 Mar 1996 to 03 Apr 1996
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Apr 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2012
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2017