Green, Andrew Frederick Donald (CPSO#: 75037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Department Of Anesthesia
Mississauga Site
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (647) 988-9134
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Green Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Green ( CPSO# 75037 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 The Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (647) 988-9134

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW FREDERICK DONALD GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2007