Green, Gerald Murray (CPSO#: 24757)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 10 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1972
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 10 Jun 1987

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Jun 1987
Summary:

 In June 1987, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Green incompetent, as defined in s. 60(4) of the 
 Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional care of a 
 patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a 
 nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice.  Consequently, the 
 Committee ordered that Dr. Green(s licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 20 Jun 1989
Hearing Date(s): Sep 29, 1986

Application for Reinstatement  
Decision Date: 18 Dec 1992
Decision: Application Accepted

Application for Reinstatement  
Decision Date: 31 Oct 1990
Decision: Application Denied

Application for Reinstatement  
Decision Date: 11 Jul 1990
Decision: Application Denied

Application for Reinstatement  
Decision Date: 14 Dec 1989
Decision: Application Denied


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Aug 1986
Summary:

 In August 1986, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Green guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he charged a fee that was excessive in 
 relation to the services performed, contrary to s. 27(9); and in that he failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21).  Consequently, the Committee 
 ordered that Dr. Green be fined the sum of $5000.00, this amount to be paid within thirty days of 
 the Order becoming final; that Dr. Green(s licence to practice be suspended for a period of one 
 year, the suspension to be served consecutive to any other suspension of licence outstanding; and 
 that if the stipulated fine was not paid, then Dr. Green(s licence would be suspended for one 
 additional year.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 14 Oct 1987
Hearing Date(s): 07 Jan 1986


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Nov 1985
Summary:

 In November 1985, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Green guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an 
 act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  Consequently, the 
 Committee ordered that Dr. Green be reprimanded, that the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the 
 Register, and that the Doctor attend to be reprimanded on a date to be set by the Registrar.  The 
 Committee further ruled that Dr. Green(s licence to practice be suspended for a period of six 
 months, and that if he failed to attend the College as required for his reprimand, then the 
 suspension of licence would continue for a further six months.

Appeal: Decision Altered
Appeal Decision Date: 13 Jan 1987
Hearing Date(s): 20 Nov 1985