Green, Gordon Martin (CPSO#: 50774)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
19 Hospital Drive
P.O. Box 664
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone: (705) 658-4544 Ext. 2269
Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON MARTIN GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2013