Green, Jeffrey Hart (CPSO#: 27418)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
226 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 1J5
Phone: (519) 637-7617
Fax: (519) 637-7428
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey H. Green Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Green ( CPSO# 27418 )

Business Address:
226 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 1J5
Phone Number: (519) 637-7617

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY HART GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975