Green, Jennifer Marion (CPSO#: 68754)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Public Health
Sexual Health Clinic
2340 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6P 4A9
Phone: (416) 392-0999
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Freedman Green Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Green ( CPSO# 68754 )
Dr. S. Freedman ( CPSO# 67820 )

Business Address:
Brampton Cardiopulmonary Services
Unit 7
31 Centre Street South
Brampton ON  L6W 2X7
Phone Number: (905) 455-3010

Business Address:
Toronto Public Health
Sexual Health Clinic
2340 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6P 4A9
Phone Number: (416) 392-0999

Business Address:
294 Main Street
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Phone Number: (416) 693-3030

Business Address:
880 Danforth Road
Scarborough ON  M1K 1H8
Phone Number: (416) 264-4848

Business Address:
1664 Dufferin Street
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1
Phone Number: (416) 652-6101

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MARION GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1998