Green, Jerome Andrew (CPSO#: 73544)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 218
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone: (905) 836-5561
Fax: (905) 836-9038
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jerome Green Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 12 2007


Corporation Name: Dr. Jerome Green Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Green ( CPSO# 73544 )

Business Address:
218 - 16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone Number: (905) 836-5561

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEROME ANDREW GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004