Green, Kevin Hugh Ian (CPSO#: 70417)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
500 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K9
Phone: (905) 576-3444
Fax: (905) 576-7980
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

600 king st e unit #17
Oshawa ON  L1H1G6
Canada
Phone: (905) 432-1017
Fax: (905) 432-0070
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Green Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Green ( CPSO# 70417 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Unit 17
600 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1G6
Phone Number: (905) 432-1017

Business Address:
500 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K9
Phone Number: (905) 576-3444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN HUGH IAN GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998