Green, Kevin Wayne (CPSO#: 69739)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304C
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 848-5599
Fax: (905) 848-8606
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Suite 300
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: (905) 773-7843
Fax: (905) 773-9614
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin W. Green Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Green ( CPSO# 69739 )

Business Address:
Suite 304C
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 848-5599

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Suite 300
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7843

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 24 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN WAYNE GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 1996 to 11 Feb 1996
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1998