Green, Peter James (CPSO#: 75756)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 20 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2000 to 15 Dec 2000
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 May 2004