Greenaway, Mary Kathleen (CPSO#: 80826)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
473 Dupont Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1Y6
Phone: (416) 588-1888
Fax: (416) 588-0388
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY KATHLEEN GREENAWAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENAWAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006