Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Greenberg, Mark Alan (CPSO#: 59605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4700 Jane Street
Suite 202
Toronto ON  M3N 2L3
Phone: (416) 661-0004
Fax: (416) 661-0810
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

69 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4T7
Canada
Phone: 807-633-6666
Fax: 807-344-4115
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

140 Syndicate Avenue South
Unit #2
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 1C6
Canada
Phone: 807-625-5400
Fax: 807-625-6520
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark A. Greenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Greenberg ( CPSO# 59605 )

Business Address:
4700 Jane Street
Suite 202
Toronto ON  M3N 2L3
Phone Number: (416) 661-0004

Business Address:
235 Syndicate Avenue South
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 1E1
Phone Number: (807) 625-5400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ALAN GREENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1989