Greenbloom, Susan Leah (CPSO#: 60954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Humber College
Suite 322
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 740-4113
Fax: (416) 740-4816
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4610 Highway 7 #200
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Canada
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: (905) 856-2602
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Greenbloom Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Greenbloom ( CPSO# 60954 )

Business Address:
322 - 89 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 740-4113

Business Address:
200 - 4610 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4Y 4Y7
Phone Number: (416) 740-4113

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN LEAH GREENBLOOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENBLOOM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1990