Greene, Mitchell Dale (CPSO#: 20763)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Oct 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Oct 2005

Concerns

Source: Complaints Committee
Active Date: October 1, 2005
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On October 1, 2005, Dr. Mitchell Dale Greene undertook to the College of Physicians and
Surgeons of Ontario the following,
-- to resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective
October 1, 2005, and
-- not to apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in
any jurisdiction.