Greene, Robert Neil (CPSO#: 62325)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 12 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2002