Greenland, Joy Suzanne (CPSO#: 73385)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2001