Greenspoon, Allen Sheldon (CPSO#: 29969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
M1-414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Phone: (905) 529-5221
Fax: (905) 546-0361
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allen Greenspoon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Greenspoon ( CPSO# 29969 )

Business Address:
Suite M-1
414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 529-5221

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 23 Jun 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 23 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]

            As from June 23, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Allen Sheldon
            Greenspoon, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Greenspoon to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                            DR. GREENSPOON
                                          ("Dr. Greenspoon")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, certificate of registration number 29969, am a member
                  of the College.  On January 25, 2012, the ICR Committee ordered that I
                  undertake a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program in
                  response to complaints that raised concerns about my management of test
                  results, including that my practice be reassessed.  The College has
                  received information regarding my standard of practice as to my medical
                  record-keeping arising from that reassessment.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this
                  Undertaking from the date on which I sign it.



            (4)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for twelve  (12) months ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts once every
                              three (3) months;
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me every three (3) months;
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              three (3) months, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (4)(d) and/or
                        (e) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, agree that if I am required to cease practise as
                        a result of section (f) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in medical record
                              keeping; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (5)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the professional education set out in section (5)(a).
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, undertake to complete this requirement within
                        six months of executing this undertaking or, if no satisfactory
                        program is available by that time, by the first possible
                        opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, undertake that, approximately six (6) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (4) above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a
                        Reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may include a chart
                        review, direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues
                        and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to
                        abide by those recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved
                        by the ICR Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) may receive and review the findings of the
                        Assessor(s), and may discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or
                        concerns arising from the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that
                        the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported
                        to the College and the report may form the basis of further action
                        by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, understand and agree that if I am of the view
                        that any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I
                        will have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the
                        recommendations within which to provide the College with my
                        submissions in this regard.  I further understand and agree that
                        thereafter, the ICR Committee will consider my submissions and make
                        a determination regarding whether or not the recommendations, or
                        any of them, are reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of
                        them, constitute limitations or restrictions on my practice, and
                        that decision will be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, undertake that, following the decision
                        referenced in section (6)(d) above, I will abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has
                        determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, hereby consent to the inclusion of any of the
                        following on the public register as terms, conditions or
                        limitations on my certificate of registration, for the purposes of
                        section 23 of the Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  (ii)any
                              recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR Committee
                              has identified in its decision referenced in section (6)(d)
                              as terms, conditions or limitations on my practice.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, undertake to inform the College of each and
                        every location in which I practise or have privileges, including,
                        but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and
                        not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice
                        Location(s) and patient records by a College representative for the
                        purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP
                        consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "B". 
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and
                  acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may
                  constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee
                  of the College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Greenspoon, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or
                  referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Greenspoon, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Greenspoon, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and
                  understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained
                  independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or
                  have waived my right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Greenspoon, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code.  I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (13)  I, Dr. Greenspoon, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on
                  the College's Register that is available to the public during the time
                  period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Greenspoon was the subject of a reassessment of his practice
                        arising from a College investigation into whether he engaged in
                        professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his family
                        practice.  As a result of the reassessment:
                  
                              "Dr. Greenspoon will practise under the guidance of a
                              Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months. 
                  
                              "Dr. Greenspoon will engage in professional education in
                              medical record-keeping.
                  
                              "Dr. Greenspoon's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 12 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Greenspoon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education
                  set out in section (5) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Greenspoon, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Greenspoon, give my irrevocable consent to any person who
                  facilitates my completion of the professional education set out in
                  section (5) above, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and
                  Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (5) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Allen Sheldon Greenspoon to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 23, 2016:

Dr. Greenspoon was the subject of a reassessment of his practice arising from a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his family practice. As a result of the reassessment:

Dr. Greenspoon will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

Dr. Greenspoon will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping.

Dr. Greenspoon's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 12 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.