Greenspoon, Jill Amy (CPSO#: 100647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Dermatology
2075 Bayview Avenue Suite M1 700
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4908
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILL AMY GREENSPOON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GREENSPOON is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. GREENSPOON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GREENSPOON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. GREENSPOON shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GREENSPOON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GREENSPOON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018