Greenspoon, Mark Barry (CPSO#: 55835)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Greenspoon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2011

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite A 495 Dunsmuir Street Nanaimo BC V9R 6B9
Date Received: 03 May 2017


Address: Greenspoon Pain Management Suite 110 164 Queen Street East Brampton, ON L6V 1B4
Date Received: 08 Apr 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017