Greenwald, Allen Gabriel (CPSO#: 95423)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
377 Church Street
Suite G06
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (289) 554-1350
Fax: (905) 205-0100
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

377 Church Street
Suite G07
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7614
Fax: 9054727618
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allen Greenwald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Greenwald ( CPSO# 95423 )

Business Address:
377 Church Street
Suite G06
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (289) 554-1350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 31 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLEN GABRIEL GREENWALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENWALD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015